Northwest Administrators Inc v. Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc. and Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00681
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Shelton-Turnbull Printers, Inc. upon Plaintiff's #6 MOTION for Default (VE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Against Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, pp 4-5 to Russell J. Reid's Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/2/2019, (Reid, Russell)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc on 5/10/2019 (Reid, Russell)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc (SNP)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 8, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc. (Receipt # 0981-5757806), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelton-Turnbull Printers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?