Ostwald v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Michele Ostwald
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Case Number: 2:2019cv00685
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson; Plaintiff's Counsel: Not Present; Defense Counsel: Not Present; Court Reporter: Nicki Drury; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 16206;Status Conference was not held on 6/25/2019 due to a clerical error. The Court orders the Status Conference reset to 7/9/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Diane Luise Polscer for Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Hickman, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C. Hickman on behalf of Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Hickman, Brian)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Polscer, Diane)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 6/25/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C.Coughenour. (PP)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C.Coughenour. (PP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
May 9, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (Polscer, Diane)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Polscer, Diane)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-10046-0 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5759381), filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polscer, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ostwald v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Diane Luise Polscer
Represented By: Brian C. Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Ostwald
Represented By: Talis M Abolins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?