Rush Group Inc et al v. HTP Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rush Group, Inc., Randall Rush, RGIC Investments Corp., RGIC Investments Corp and Rush Group Inc
Defendant: Evan Johnson, Henry W Dean, Phillip Jennings, HTP, Inc., HTP Inc and Henry Dean
Case Number: 2:2019cv00691
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIPT from King County Superior Court re #6 Remand Order on Stipulated Motion. (PM)
May 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. re #6 Order on Stipulated Motion (MW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court (MW)(cc: State Court w/docket sheet & #6 Order)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting parties' #4 Stipulated Motion to Remand: The Clerk of Court shall immediately REMAND this matter to the Superior Court of the State of Washington for King County, each party to bear its own costs and fees associated with the removal and remand of this action. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #4 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Remand and [Proposed] Order. Filed by Plaintiffs RGIC Investments Corp, Randall Rush, Rush Group Inc. Noting Date 5/14/2019, (Escobar, Andrew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Remand and [Proposed] Order, filed by Plaintiffs RGIC Investments Corp, Randall Rush, Rush Group Inc. Noting Date 6/7/2019, (Escobar, Andrew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/16/2019. (SNP)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
May 9, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-11400-2-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5760424), filed by Evan Johnson, Phillip Jennings, HTP, Inc., Henry W Dean. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Cadranell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush Group Inc et al v. HTP Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rush Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Rush
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGIC Investments Corp.
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGIC Investments Corp
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rush Group Inc
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Joseph Daniel Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Johnson
Represented By: Dennis John McGlothin
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry W Dean
Represented By: Dennis John McGlothin
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Jennings
Represented By: Dennis John McGlothin
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTP, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis John McGlothin
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTP Inc
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Dean
Represented By: Robert Joseph Cadranell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?