Northwest Administrators Inc v. ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00692
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing action with prejudice per parties' #9 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice by parties (Reid, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Defendant's #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ConAgra has up to and including Friday, 6/28/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher L Ottele on behalf of Defendant ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc. (Ottele, Christopher)
June 6, 2019 NOTE: re: #6 Motion for Extension. The appearance of attorney Christopher L. Ottele is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (PM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher L. Ottele re ConAgra's Motion for Extension, #2 Proposed Order Order on Motion for Extension) Noting Date 6/14/2019, (Ottele, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc on 5/17/2019 (Reid, Russell)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/21/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc. (GT)
May 10, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc (Receipt # 0981-5760860), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Foods Enterprise Services Inc
Represented By: Christopher L Ottele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?