AGCS Marine Insurance Company et al v. Expeditors International of Washington Inc et al
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Company, United Technologies Corporation, Goodrich Corporation, Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd. and Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington, Inc., Expeditors International Forwarding and Expeditors International of Washington Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00718
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Expeditors International Forwarding on 5/23/2019, filed by Plaintiffs AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd, Goodrich Corporation, United Technologies Corporation. (Gaspich, Anthony)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. on 5/23/2019, filed by Plaintiffs AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd, Goodrich Corporation, United Technologies Corporation. (Gaspich, Anthony)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Goodrich Canada, Inc. for Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd; Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Goodrich Corporation; Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company for AGCS Marine Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd, Goodrich Corporation, United Technologies Corporation (Gaspich, Anthony)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiffs must file Corporate Disclosure Statements by 5/22/2019. (GT)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Expeditors International Forwarding and Expeditors International of Washington Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
May 15, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (GT)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Expeditors International Forwarding, Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. (Receipt # 0981-5766691) Attorney Anthony J Gaspich added to party AGCS Marine Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony J Gaspich added to party Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony J Gaspich added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony J Gaspich added to party United Technologies Corporation(pty:pla), filed by United Technologies Corporation, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd., Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Expeditors Int'l of Washington, Inc., #4 Summons Expeditors Int'l Forwarding)(Gaspich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGCS Marine Insurance Company et al v. Expeditors International of Washington Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony J Gaspich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J Gaspich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J Gaspich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony J Gaspich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodrich Aerospace Canada Ltd
Represented By: Anthony J Gaspich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International Forwarding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expeditors International of Washington Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?