King Electrical Manufacturing Co v. Universal Logistics Holdings Inc
Plaintiff: King Electrical Manufacturing Co. and King Electrical Manufacturing Co
Defendant: Universal Logistics Holding, Inc., Universal Intermodal Services, Inc. and Universal Logistics Holdings Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00725
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Jeff M. Sbaih, on behalf of Universal Intermodal Services, Inc., on 7/2/2019. (Hagen, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Universal Intermodal Services, Inc., filed by King Electrical Manufacturing Co. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hagen, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Parties' #15 Stipulation for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint: Plaintiff may file its Second Amended Complaint within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4. (Hagen, Daniel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by parties (Hagen, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Universal Logistics Holdings Inc.(Sbaih, Jeff)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff King Electrical Manufacturing Co (Hagen, Daniel)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) King Electrical Manufacturing Co, filed by King Electrical Manufacturing Co.(Hagen, Daniel)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting parties' #9 Stipulation for Leave to Amend and Vacating #7 Order to Show Cause: Plaintiff may, within seven days of the date of this Order, file an amended complaint in the form of Exhibit A to the Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to Amend Complaint by parties (Hagen, Daniel) Modified docket text on 5/23/2019 (SWT).
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by King Electrical Manufacturing Co (Hagen, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 #7 Order to Show Cause, NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 5/31/2019 (MW)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 5/31/2019, why the Court should not remand this action to state court by providing the Court with the citizenship of all of the owners/members of the plaintiff LLC at the time the complaint was filed. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dylan E Jackson on behalf of Defendant Universal Logistics Holdings Inc. (Jackson, Dylan)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, King Electrical Manufacturing Co must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/23/2019. (GT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
May 16, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Universal Logistics Holding, Inc. (Sbaih, Jeff)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Jeff M. Sbaih by Defendant Universal Logistics Holding, Inc. (Sbaih, Jeff)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-10471-6; (Receipt # 0981-5768481), filed by Universal Logistics Holding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sbaih, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King Electrical Manufacturing Co v. Universal Logistics Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Electrical Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Represented By: Daniel T Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Electrical Manufacturing Co
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Represented By: Daniel T Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Logistics Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff M Sbaih
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Intermodal Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Logistics Holdings Inc
Represented By: Jeff M Sbaih
Represented By: Dylan E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?