Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust et al v. Reed Trucking & Excavating Inc
Plaintiff: Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers and its Affiliated Union Locals, Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust and Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers
Defendant: Reed Trucking & Excavating, Inc. and Reed Trucking & Excavating Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00731
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Plaintiffs' #5 Motion for Default. Defendant Reed Trucking & Excavation, Inc. is in default. (AD)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of support of Motion of Default filed by Plaintiffs Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust re #5 MOTION for Default (Stoll, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Default , filed by Plaintiffs Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Default) Noting Date 6/18/2019, (Stoll, Mary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Shawn Reed on 5/22/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust. (Stoll, Mary)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust (Stoll, Mary)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Reed Trucking & Excavating Inc (SNP)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/24/2019 (if applicable). (SNP)
May 17, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AGREEMENT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5769100) Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers and its Affiliated Union Locals(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust(pty:pla), filed by Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers and its Affiliated Union Locals, Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Letter requesting assignment to Seattle, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A--Labor Agreement, #5 Exhibit B--Trust Agreement Excerpts, #6 Exhibit C--Auditor's Letter of Attempts)(Stoll, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust et al v. Reed Trucking & Excavating Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Trucking & Excavating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Trucking & Excavating Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers and its Affiliated Union Locals
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?