Raethke v. Boe
Petitioner: Robert Raymond Raethke
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00733
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Respondent Jeri Boe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-16)**PRINT NEF ONLY: Documents will be served in paper form.**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(Weisser, Paul)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Respondent's Answer and Memorandum RESPONSE to #4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jeri Boe. Noting Date 8/9/2019, **PRINT ALL**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(Weisser, Paul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Douglas Weisser on behalf of Respondent Jeri Boe. **PRINT ALL**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(Weisser, Paul)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying Petitioner's #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707) (TH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Robert Raymond Raethke. Noted by Clerk for 6/28/2019, **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707) (TH)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Clallam Bay Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(TH)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Documents served electronically to Respondent and Attorney General of the State of Washington on 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(SG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Robert Raymond Raethke (Receipt # SEA096229) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**41 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(ST)
May 29, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected **DO NOT PRINT**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(ST)
May 29, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: Receipt# SEA096229; $5.00 **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(ST)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 6/17/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(ST)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Robert Raymond Raethke. (NO IFP/NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**41 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Raethke, Prisoner ID: 908707)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raethke v. Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Represented By: Paul Douglas Weisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Raymond Raethke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?