Ryan v. Hansen et al
Plaintiff: Devin Michael Ryan
Defendant: Anstett, Miller, Hansen, Blankenship, Snohomish County Sheriff's Office, Downing and Snohomish County
Case Number: 2:2019cv00753
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Hansen mailed on 6/21/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(Bides, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marc Bides on behalf of Defendant Hansen. **PRINT ALL**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(Bides, Marc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Anstett, Blankenship, Downing, Hansen, Miller, Snohomish County, filed by Devin Michael Ryan. **23 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195) (PM)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING FOUR DEFENDANTS AND DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Deputy Hanson Snohomish County Jail, and copy mailed to Snohomish County Prosecuting Attorney's Office on 6/21/19. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(SG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Hansen, filed by Devin Michael Ryan. (defendants terminated: Anstett, Downing, Blankenship, Miller and Snohomish County Sheriff's Office) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(SG)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(SG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Devin Michael Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 prison trust account statement)**15 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(SG)
June 11, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter, **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(SG)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- The prison trust account submitted showed transactions through 12/31/18. The court requires that you provide a copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Please submit an updated prison trust account statement. Filer has until 6/19/2019 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(ST)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Devin Michael Ryan (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)**13 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Devin Ryan, Prisoner ID: 382195)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. Hansen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Michael Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anstett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansen
Represented By: Marc Bides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?