Wineland et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Wineland and Susan Wineland
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., sued as successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and successor in interest to BF STURTEVANT, Crane Co., General Electric Company, Ingersoll Rand Company, Warren Pumps, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Carrier Corporation and Flowserve US, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00793
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 42 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 15. (Weinstein, Brian)
July 11, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER - Per the request of the parties and for good cause shown, the deadline for the Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan has been extended to Wednesday, July 17, 2019. (KERR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 40 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiffs Charlotte Wineland, Susan Wineland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Weinstein, Brian)
July 3, 2019 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve US Inc (Odom, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Odom, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ingersoll Rand Company (Tuvim, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Tuvim, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Tuvim, Mark)
June 25, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, F/K/A THE DURIRON COMPANY, IMPROPERLY DENOMINATED AS FLOWSERVE US, INC. (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY, BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC., DURCO INTERNATIONAL, AND EDWARD VALVE, INC.) with JURY DEMAND by Flowserve US Inc.(Dinsdale, Christine)
June 25, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES, IMPROPERLY DENOMINATED AS "FLOWSERVE US, INC. (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY, BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC., DURCO INTERNATIONAL, AND EDWARD VALVE, INC.)" with JURY DEMAND by Flowserve US Inc.(Dinsdale, Christine)
June 24, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND by Flowserve US Inc.(Carlton, Marc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Rachel Tallon Reynolds on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Reynolds, Rachel)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrew Seitz for Plaintiffs Charlotte Wineland and Susan Wineland, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrew Seitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Charlotte Wineland, Susan Wineland (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5818789 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Weinstein, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Attorneys Kevin J Craig, Trevor J. Mohr added for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company; per #26 , #27 Notices of Appearance. (MW)
June 21, 2019 Attorney Erin P Fraser for CBS Corporation added; per #23 Answer to Complaint. (MW)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company. (Tuvim, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate Gamco Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CBS Corporation (Marks, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Electric Company (Marks, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Christopher S Marks added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft) by CBS Corporation.(Marks, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with JURY DEMAND by General Electric Company.(Marks, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Warren Pumps LLC.(Eraut, Allen)
June 19, 2019 Attorney Randy J Aliment for Flowserve US Inc added; per #19 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve US Inc (Carlton, Marc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marc Marshall Carlton on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Carlton, Marc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve US Inc (Dinsdale, Christine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crane Co (Shaw, G)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Crane Co.(Shaw, G)
June 13, 2019 Attorney Rachel A Rubin for Flowserve US Inc added; per #14 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Carrier Corporation.(Vollans, Ryan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine E Dinsdale on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Dinsdale, Christine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve US Inc (Dinsdale, Christine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine E Dinsdale on behalf of Defendant Flowserve US Inc. (Dinsdale, Christine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Eraut, Allen)
June 12, 2019 Attorney Nicole R. MacKenzie for Carrier Corporation added; per #9 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carrier Corporation (Vollans, Ryan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan W Vollans on behalf of Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Vollans, Ryan)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
June 11, 2019 Changed the Firm Name for attorneys Brian Weinstein and Alexandra Caggiano to Weinstein Caggiano as well as emails, address remained the same. (DS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Weinstein on behalf of Plaintiffs Charlotte Wineland, Susan Wineland. (Weinstein, Brian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Alexandra B Caggiano and Brian Weinstein for Plaintiffs Charlotte Wineland, Susan Wineland. (Weinstein, Brian)
June 6, 2019 Attorney Ryan J Groshong for Crane Co added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Crane Co. (Shaw, G)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Eraut, Allen)
June 5, 2019 Attorney Erin P Fraser for General Electric Company added; per #3 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher S Marks on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company. (Marks, Christopher)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(SNP)
May 29, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SNP)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., sued as successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and successor in interest to BF STURTEVANT, Carrier Corporation, Crane Co., Does 1-350 Inclusive, Flowserve US, Inc., General Electric Company, Ingersoll Rand Company, Warren Pumps, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5781049) Attorney Brian Weinstein added to party Charlotte Wineland(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Weinstein added to party Susan Wineland(pty:pla), filed by Charlotte Wineland, Susan Wineland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, #4 Summons Carrier Corporation, #5 Summons CBS Corporation, #6 Summons Crane Co., #7 Summons Flowserve US, Inc., #8 Summons General Electric Company, #9 Summons Ingersoll Rand Company, #10 Summons Warren Pumps, LLC)(Weinstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wineland et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Wineland
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Andrew Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wineland
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Andrew Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., sued as successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and successor in interest to BF STURTEVANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By:
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?