Johnson v. Providence Health & Services
Plaintiff: Kristina Johnson
Defendant: Providence and Providence Health & Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv00794
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/26/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by Providence Health & Services.(Rosen, Kathryn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/6/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
May 29, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SNP)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Providence (Lehmann, Paula)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Providence (Lehmann, Paula)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Providence (Lehmann, Paula)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Filing Notice of Removal in Superior Court by Defendant Providence (Lehmann, Paula)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-11219-1; (Receipt # 0981-5781056), filed by Providence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Lehmann, Paula) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #3 Complaint) (SNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Providence Health & Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Johnson
Represented By: Cody Fenton-Robertson
Represented By: Matthew J Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence
Represented By: Jordann Hallstrom
Represented By: Paula L Lehmann
Represented By: Kathryn S Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services
Represented By: Jordann Hallstrom
Represented By: Paula L Lehmann
Represented By: Kathryn S Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?