Parekh v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Pramod Parekh and Pramod Ambalal Parekh
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Kevin McAleenan, William Barr and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2019cv00798
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Lambert filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Return (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Lambert, Michelle)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jennings filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox re #6 MOTION to Dismiss and Return (Lambert, Michelle)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Return, filed by Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2019, (Lambert, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Respondents William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Warden, Bryan S Wilcox. (Lambert, Michelle)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 2241 Petition. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United States Attorney and respondent(s). On or before June 28, 2019, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report and note it for July 26, 2019. Petitioner may file a response on or before July 22, 2019. Respondent(s) may file a reply on or before the noting date. (cc: petitioner via USPS)(ST)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 2241 Petition. (cc: petitioner via USPS)(ST)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: petitioner via USPS) (ST)
May 28, 2019 Judge James L. Robart and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ST)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 2241 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (Receipt # 0981-5781900), filed by Pramod Parekh. (Attachments: #1 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel, #2 Letter of FPD)(Murphy, Gregory) Modified on 5/28/2019 - documents regenerated to U.S. Attorney's Office. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parekh v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pramod Parekh
Represented By: Gregory Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pramod Ambalal Parekh
Represented By: Gregory Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan S Wilcox
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?