Flores v. Safeway Inc
Plaintiff: Cherri Flores
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00825
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel John Turner Kugler for Defendant Safeway Inc from 8/16/19 to 9/4/19. (Kugler, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-5. Filed by Plaintiff Cherri Flores.(Dore, James)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Cherri Flores, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand (Dore, James)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of John Kugler filed by Defendant Safeway Inc re #8 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Statement of Damages)(Kugler, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE, by Defendant Safeway Inc, to #8 MOTION to Remand . (Kugler, John)
June 26, 2019 JSR due NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 8/7/2019. (KAM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report, and Early Settlement. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/31/2019, Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (TH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Cherri Flores. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James J Dore Jr, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/5/2019, (Dore, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour and referred to Judge J Richard Creatura for all further proceedings by Kelly Miller, Deputy Clerk, on behalf of Clerk of Court, William M. McCool. (KAM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 6/10/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
June 3, 2019 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SNP)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Safeway Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court records)(Kugler, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Safeway Inc (Kugler, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AB Acquisition LLC for Safeway Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeway Inc (Kugler, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-08025-6 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5787388), filed by Safeway Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Statement of Damages, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kugler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Safeway Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc
Represented By: John Turner Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherri Flores
Represented By: James J. Dore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?