Gill v. Magan et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Gill
Defendant: Mike Officer Mansur, Snohomish County, Michael P Magan, Officer Michael Gonzalez, City of Seattle, Michael Gonzalez, Michael Magan and Mike Mansur
Case Number: 2:2019cv00860
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Darryl Parker for Plaintiff Nancy Gill from December 18, 2019 to December 25, 2019. (Parker, Darryl)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 9/12/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(RM)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/29/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/5/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
June 19, 2019 Attorney Marc Bides added as counsel for Mike Mansur and Snohomish County per #13 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Mike Mansur mailed on 6/7/2019 (Bosch, Katherine)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine H Bosch on behalf of Defendants Mike Mansur, Snohomish County. (Bosch, Katherine)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint; by City of Seattle, Michael Gonzalez, Michael Magan.(Park, Susan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Nancy Gill (Parker, Darryl)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mike Mansur, Snohomish County (Attachments: #1 Summons - Snohomish County)(PM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Nancy Gill (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Parker, Darryl)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ghazal Sharifi on behalf of Defendants City of Seattle, Michael Gonzalez, Michael Magan. (Sharifi, Ghazal)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
June 5, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (GT)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Michael Gonzalez, Michael P Magan. (Park, Susan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Michael Gonzalez, Michael P Magan. (Park, Susan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Susan E. Park re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants City of Seattle, Michael Gonzalez, Michael P Magan (Park, Susan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants City of Seattle, Michael Gonzalez, Michael P Magan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Park, Susan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 19-2-04053-31; (Receipt # 0981-5792537), filed by Michael Gonzalez, Michael P Magan, City of Seattle. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B)(Park, Susan) Modified on 6/5/2019 (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. Magan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Officer Mansur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snohomish County
Represented By: Marc Bides
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P Magan
Represented By: Susan E Park
Represented By: Ghazal Sharifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michael Gonzalez
Represented By: Susan E Park
Represented By: Ghazal Sharifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Susan E Park
Represented By: Ghazal Sharifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gonzalez
Represented By: Susan E Park
Represented By: Ghazal Sharifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Magan
Represented By: Susan E Park
Represented By: Ghazal Sharifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Mansur
Represented By: Marc Bides
Represented By: Katherine H Bosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Gill
Represented By: Darryl Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?