York v. ABC - Pacific Corporation
Plaintiff: Trisha York
Defendant: ABC - Pacific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00863
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) (MW)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Trisha York (Chamberlain, Felicity)
June 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Upon the joint request of the parties, and the Court finding good cause, the Court extends the initial case deadlines as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/24/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/31/2019, Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019. (VE)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on ABC Pacific Corporation on 6/7/2019, filed by Plaintiff Trisha York. (Chamberlain, Felicity)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/24/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/1/2019, Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristin Nealey Meier on behalf of Defendant ABC - Pacific Corporation. (Meier, Kristin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant ABC - Pacific Corporation. (GT)
June 5, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) ABC - Pacific Corporation (Receipt # 0981-5793885), filed by Trisha York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Chamberlain, Felicity)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. ABC - Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha York
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Felicity Abigail Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC - Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Kristin Nealey Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?