Eckard v Nikolina et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Allen Eckard
Defendant: Anthony Aston, Ty Trenary and Nadhezda Nikolina
Case Number: 2:2019cv00881
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re #10 MOTION to Alter Judgment re #9 Judgment by Court by Plaintiff Gabriel Allen Eckard (even though case # 19-cv-879-RAJ-MAT written on pleading, clerk linked Supplement to this Motion in 19-CV-881-RSM. 19-CV-879 no motion filed) (SG)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Alter Judgment re #9 Judgment by Court, filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Allen Eckard. (SG)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Anthony Aston, Nadhezda Nikolina, Ty Trenary against Gabriel Allen Eckard. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING ACTION signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The dismissal shall count as a STRIKE under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (cc: plaintiff via USPS)(ST)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Allen Eckard. (SG)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #5 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2019, Noting Date 6/28/2019, (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)(ST)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gabriel Allen Eckard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SG)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Snohomish County Jail Finance Department) by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SG)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Gabriel Eckard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/10/2019) (SG). Modified on 6/10/2019 -correct image for attachment #1(SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckard v Nikolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Aston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Trenary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadhezda Nikolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Allen Eckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?