National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA v. Expedia Inc
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Defendant: Expedia, Inc. and Expedia Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00896
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Expedia Inc (Carr, Susannah)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA by Expedia Inc.(Carr, Susannah)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
July 1, 2019 Attorneys Franklin Dennis Cordell, Guinevere Becker Bogusz added for Expedia Inc per #4 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Susannah Carr on behalf of Defendant Expedia Inc. (Carr, Susannah)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AIUH LLC, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA (Baker, Gabriel)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/17/2019. (GT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Expedia Inc. (GT)
June 10, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Expedia, Inc. (Receipt # 0981-5799090) Attorney Gabriel Baker added to party National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA(pty:pla), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA v. Expedia Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Benjamin J. Roesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Inc
Represented By: Franklin Dennis Cordell
Represented By: Guinevere Becker Bogusz
Represented By: Susannah Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?