David v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Gary C.J. David and Gary C J David
Defendant: David W Smith, Eileen G Smith and Ellen R Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv00898
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 9/12/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (RM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Defendants' REPLY, by Plaintiff Gary C J David, to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively For More Definite Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SWT)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Gary C J David, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SWT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Defendants David W Smith, Eileen G Smith, Ellen R Smith, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively For More Definite Statement (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of David Smith filed by Defendants David W Smith, Eileen G Smith, Ellen R Smith re #7 MOTION to Remand (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Defendants David W Smith, Eileen G Smith, Ellen R Smith, to #7 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/29/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/5/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (RM)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER correcting misapprehension of Plaintiff concerning the "noting date" of any motion filed with the Court re: #9 Response to Motion, re: #6 Motion to Dismiss. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Gary C J David, to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively For More Definite Statement and REQUEST to Reschedule Calendar for Oral Argument. (PM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants David W Smith, Eileen G Smith, Ellen R Smith (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand (Remand of Removal), filed by Plaintiff Gary C J David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) Noted by Clerk for 7/12/2019, (SWT)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively For More Definite Statement, filed by Defendants David W Smith, Eileen G Smith, Ellen R Smith. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/12/2019, (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE re #1 Notice of Removal To Replace Page 3 by Defendants David W Smith, Eileen G Smith, Ellen R Smith (Ross, Henry)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Henry G Ross on behalf of Defendants David W Smith, Eileen G Smith, Ellen R Smith. (Ross, Henry)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment (cc: plaintiff via US Mail). (SNP)
June 10, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-12431-8; (Receipt # 0981-5799789), filed by Ellen R Smith, Eileen G Smith, David W Smith. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VandenBerghe, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary C.J. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary C J David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Smith
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen G Smith
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen R Smith
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Represented By: Henry G Ross,
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?