Park Meridian Condominium Association v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Park Meridian Condominium Association
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv00903
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 8/13/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Sotirhos, Maria)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Allstate Insurance Company.(Donohue, Alfred)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Park Meridian Condominium Association (Stein, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour as related to C18-1645JCC. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR)
June 12, 2019 Attorney Alfred E Donohue for Allstate Insurance Company added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Maria E Sotirhos on behalf of Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Sotirhos, Maria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Allstate Insurance Company (SNP)
June 11, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SNP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:18-cv-01645-JCC, by Plaintiff Park Meridian Condominium Association. (Stein, Daniel)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Allstate Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5801177), filed by Park Meridian Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Allstate)(Stein, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park Meridian Condominium Association v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred E Donohue
Represented By: Maria E Sotirhos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Meridian Condominium Association
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Represented By: Jerry H. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?