Sibert v. King County Department of Community and Human Services Behavioral Health and Recovery Division et al
Plaintiff: Joel Sibert
Defendant: Bill Wilson, Lifeline Connections, Adreienne Spiers, King County Department of Community and Human Services and King County Department of Community and Human Services Behavioral Health and Recovery Division
Case Number: 2:2019cv00904
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/5/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/12/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Joel Sibert (Good, Moloy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SNP)
June 11, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SNP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) King County Department of Community and Human Services, Lifeline Connections, Adreienne Spiers, Bill Wilson with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5801378), filed by Joel Sibert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Good, Moloy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sibert v. King County Department of Community and Human Services Behavioral Health and Recovery Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeline Connections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adreienne Spiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Department of Community and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Department of Community and Human Services Behavioral Health and Recovery Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Sibert
Represented By: Moloy K Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?