Alexander v. Patel et al
Petitioner: Gary Wayne Alexander
Respondent: Mr Cooper Mortgage, Amar Patel, Kevin R McCarthy and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00906
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated, re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (TF)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Petitioner Gary Wayne Alexander (Alexander, Gary)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE: Petitioner Gary Wayne Alexander has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert W McDonald on behalf of Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation. (McDonald, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph W. McIntosh on behalf of Respondent Kevin R McCarthy. (McIntosh, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. The Complaint and Exhibit contain personal identifiers that are required to be redacted per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2, and has been administratively sealed. Please file a redacted version of the document as soon as practicable. This will not affect your original filing date. (cc: plaintiff via US Mail)(SNP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kevin R McCarthy, Mr Cooper Mortgage, Amar Patel, Quality Loan Service Corporation (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # SEA096369), filed by Gary Wayne Alexander. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SNP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Patel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr Cooper Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin R McCarthy
Represented By: Joseph W. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Robert W McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Wayne Alexander
Represented By: Gary Wayne Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?