Collier v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Linda Collier
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00932
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wakefield, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *4-6 DAY* - Jury Trial is set for 6/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 8/27/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/2/2019, Motions due by 1/2/2020, Discovery completed by 1/31/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/2/2020, Motions in Limine due by 5/26/2020, Pretrial Order due by 6/16/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/16/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/16/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Daniel R Kirkpatrick for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from July 26 - Aug 1, 2019. (Kirkpatrick, Daniel)(PM).
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Scott Channing Wakefield for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from July 26 - Aug 1, 2019. (Wakefield, Scott)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4-6. Filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wakefield, Scott)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Scott Channing Wakefield. Filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Wakefield, Scott) Modified Firm Name and Address on 8/5/2019 (DS).
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Daniel R Kirkpatrick. Filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Kirkpatrick, Daniel) Modified Firm Name and Address on 8/5/2019 (DS).
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint; by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wakefield, Scott)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice-Other, by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wakefield, Scott)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/23/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/30/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wakefield, Scott)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 6/25/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/24/2019. (SNP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
June 17, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SNP)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE AMENDED Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wakefield, Scott) Modified on 6/17/2019, modified docket text to correspond with document title (KB).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-12418-1 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5808385), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons and Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Jury Demand)(Wakefield, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #5 Complaint) (SNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Channing Wakefield
Represented By: Daniel R Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Collier
Represented By: Jeff Nicholas Comstock
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Bechtold
Represented By: Janelle M Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?