Gomez-Cervantes et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Miguel Gomez-Cervantes
Respondent: William Barr, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 2:2019cv00944
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Priscilla To-Yin Chan on behalf of Respondents William Barr, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Chan, Priscilla)
August 8, 2019 NOTE: re #5 Second Stipulated Motion. The appearance of attorney Pricilla Chan is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (PM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting parties' #7 Second Stipulated Motion For Extension Of Time. Respondents shall file their habeas return on or before August 23, 2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM) cc: Ad hoc Pricilla Chan
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Second Stipulated MOTION for Order Extending Deadline for Return Memorandum and Status Report, filed by Respondents William Barr, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Noting Date 8/8/2019, (Chan, Priscilla)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting parties' #5 Stipulation Motion For Extension Of Time. Respondents shall file their habeas return on or before August 9, 2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Return Memorandum and Status Report by parties (Chan, Priscilla)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United Sates Attorney and respondent(s). On or before July 19, 2019, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note the return for consideration on August 16, 2019. Petitioner may file and serve a response on or before August 12, 2019, and respondent(s) may file and serve a reply on or before the noting date. (SG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Petitioner Miguel Gomez-Cervantes. (Frick, William)
June 18, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ST)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION For Emergency TRO and 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Miguel Gomez-Cervantes. (Receipt # 0981-5811236), (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit )(Frick, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 to change event to motion for TRO. Motion documents regenerated to AUSA.) (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez-Cervantes et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Priscilla To-Yin Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Gomez-Cervantes
Represented By: William Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?