Hong v. Recreational Equipment Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tony Hong
Defendant: Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv00951
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2019. (AD)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendants Does 1-10, Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel Krieg in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/13/2019, (Kazemba, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Recreational Equipment Inc (Kazemba, David)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David A Kazemba on behalf of Defendants Does 1-10, Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc. (Kazemba, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Recreational Equipment, Inc. on 6/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff Tony Hong. (Riojas, Rogelio)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (SNP)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
June 19, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5812856), filed by Tony Hong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons Recreational Equipment Inc., #5 Summons Samuel Krieg, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riojas, Rogelio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong v. Recreational Equipment Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hong
Represented By: Rogelio Omar Riojas
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Krieg
Represented By: David A Kazemba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recreational Equipment Inc
Represented By: David A Kazemba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: David A Kazemba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?