Butler v. Raugh
Plaintiff: Amelia Butler
Defendant: Si Ho Raugh and Canty-Basham
Case Number: 2:2019cv00964
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS. The Court ORDERS that C19-964RSM and C19-965RSM shall be CONSOLIDATED. All future documents shall be filed only under the consolidated cause number C19-964RSM and shall not be filed under other cause numbers. As to pending motions in Butler v. Raugh, Case No. C19-964RSM (W.D. Wash.): Plaintiff's #14 "Motion for more time and additional extension to file amended complaint" is granted in part; Plaintiff's #23 "MOTION for clarification for the court and approval of third complaint" is granted in part; Plaintiff's #24 "Notice and Conflict of interest and Motion to remove" defense counsel is denied as moot. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend her complaint and GRANTED additional time to do so. Within forty-five (45) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a single, consolidated complaint setting forth all of Plaintiff's claims against both Defendants. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
August 5, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Si Ho Raugh (Smith, Elisha)
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE and Conflict of Interest and MOTION to Remove John H. Wiegenstein, Elsiha S. SMith, Heller Weigenstein PLLC and Fire Claim Specialist as Current Attorneys and Legal Representers, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. Noted by Clerk 8/16/2019, (SWT)
July 31, 2019 ***Motion terminated: #21 MOTION for Clarification for the Court and Approval of Third Complaint filed by Amelia Butler (received by mail). (Duplicate received over the counter on same day. See Dkt. #23 ) (SWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Clarification for the Court and Approval of Third Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. Noted by Clerk for 8/16/2019, (SWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Amelia Butler re #7 Amended Complaint and all documents (SWT)
July 31, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Clarification for the Court and Approval of Third Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. Noted by Clerk for 8/16/2019, (SWT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 PRAECIPE to attach document Declaration re #17 Declaration by Defendant Si Ho Raugh (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Smith, Elisha)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE re: #17 Declaration was improperly signed by Si Ho Raugh. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (PM)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing parties to show cause within fourteen (14) days as to: (1) why this case is or is not related to Case No. C19-965RSM and (2) why this case should or should not be consolidated with Case No. C19-965RSM. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #16 Response to Motion to Extend Time (Smith, Elisha)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Si Ho Raugh filed by Defendant Si Ho Raugh re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Elisha)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Defendant Si Ho Raugh, to #14 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Smith, Elisha)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION to #11 Notice of Appearance, #13 Notice of Related Case by Plaintiff Amelia Butler (SWT)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Amelia Butler. Noted by Clerk for 7/26/2019, (TH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-CV-00965, by Defendant Si Ho Raugh. (Smith, Elisha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Si Ho Raugh re #11 Notice of Appearance (Smith, Elisha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elisha Sandra Smith on behalf of Defendant Si Ho Raugh. (Smith, Elisha)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #9 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Elisha S. Smith. As such, Ms. Smith was not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. Or, file a Notice of Appearance with the correct electronic signature. (PM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Si Ho Raugh re #9 Notice of Appearance (Wiegenstein, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Henry Wiegenstein on behalf of Defendant Si Ho Raugh. (Wiegenstein, John)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's #7 Amended Complaint without prejudice; granting Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Si Ho Raugh with JURY DEMAND, filed by Amelia Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant Si Ho Raugh with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Amelia Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (PM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Amelia Butler. (TH)
June 21, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. Hon. Michelle L. Peterson no longer assigned to case. (GT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 7/22/2019 to correct (GT)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Amelia L Butler (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Amended Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons)(GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Raugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Si Ho Raugh
Represented By: Elisha Sandra Smith
Represented By: John Henry Wiegenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canty-Basham
Represented By: Elisha Sandra Smith
Represented By: John Henry Wiegenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?