Harbers v. Eddie Bauer LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Harbers
Defendant: Does 1 - 20, Eddie Bauer LLC and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2019cv00968
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul Karl Lukacs for Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 5, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul Karl Lukacs FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5873363 (Corrington, Che)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Remand (Hattis, Daniel)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete class discovery: 11/18/2019; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: 12/18/2019. (AD)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 8/27/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/20/2019. (AD)
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC re #16 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Levy, Marc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC, to #13 MOTION to Remand . Oral Argument Requested. (Levy, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #11 ) re parties' #14 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order re Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers. Noting Date 7/9/2019, (Corrington, Che)
July 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Harbers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2019, (Hattis, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Levy, Marc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2019, (Levy, Marc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shewmake, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephanie Sheridan for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Meegan Brooks for defendant Eddie Bauer LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony Anscombe for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephanie Sheridan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5822955 (Levy, Marc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Meegan Brooks FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5822949 (Levy, Marc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony Anscombe FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Eddie Bauer LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5822940 (Levy, Marc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
June 24, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Eddie Bauer Parent LLC, Corporate Parent Everest Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent PSEB LLC, Corporate Parent PSEB Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Everest Topco LLC for Eddie Bauer LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Eddie Bauer LLC (Levy, Marc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Washington for King County, case number 19-2-13499-2 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5817804), filed by Eddie Bauer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit A)(Levy, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbers v. Eddie Bauer LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Bauer LLC
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Represented By: Stephanie Sheridan
Represented By: Meegan Brooks
Represented By: Anthony Anscombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Harbers
Represented By: Daniel M Hattis
Represented By: Che Z Corrington
Represented By: Paul Karl Lukacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?