Alexander v. U S Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Gary Wayne Alexander
Defendant: Does 1 - 10, Raja Venugopal, Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington, Mr Cooper and U S Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv00971
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington, filed by Plaintiff Gary Wayne Alexander. (Alexander, Gary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiff Gary Wayne Alexander. (Alexander, Gary) Modified to indicate response, not motion on 8/15/2019 (MW).
August 15, 2019 ***Motion terminated: #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gary Wayne Alexander. Document is a response. (MW)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE: Plaintiff Gary Wayne Alexander has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder (McDonald, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Joinder, filed by Defendant Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibits) Noting Date 8/23/2019, (McDonald, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Christopher G. Varallo filed by Defendants Mr Cooper, U S Bank National Association re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-G, #3 Exhibit H-K)(Varallo, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Mr Cooper, U S Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/23/2019, (Varallo, Christopher)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendants Mr Cooper, U S Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/9/2019, (Varallo, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Evan L Loeffler on behalf of Defendant Raja Venugopal. (Loeffler, Evan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher G. Varallo on behalf of Defendants Mr Cooper, U S Bank National Association. (Varallo, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Attorney Steven Joseph Dixson added for Mr Cooper, U S Bank National Association; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert W McDonald on behalf of Defendant Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington. (McDonald, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form as to defendant(s) Cooper, Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington, U S Bank National Association, Raja Venugopal due to voluminous number of summons(es) filed. (Main document - summons US Bank) (Attachments: #1 Summons Cooper, #2 Summons Quality Loan Service, #3 Summons Venugopal)(CDA)(mailed to plaintiff via US Mail)
June 24, 2019 Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number SEA096612 (SNP)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Gary Wayne Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U S Bank, #3 Summons Cooper, #4 Summons Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington, #5 Summons Raja Venugopal, #6 Email transmittal) (receipt number SEA096612)(CDA) Modified on 6/24/2019 to reflect filing fee(MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. U S Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raja Venugopal
Represented By: Evan L Loeffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp of Washington
Represented By: Robert W McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Cooper
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Bank National Association
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wayne Alexander
Represented By: Gary Wayne Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?