Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC v. Smartosc US LLC
Plaintiff: Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC
Defendant: Smartosc US LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01002
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on SMARTOSC US LLC on 7/3/2019, filed by Plaintiff Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC. (Ranallo, Nicholas)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jay Johnson for Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Leigh Rothschild for Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC (Ranallo, Nicholas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jay Johnson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5827928 (Ranallo, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/5/2019. (GT)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Smartosc US LLC. (GT)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (GT)
June 28, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Smartosc US LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5824813) Attorney Nicholas R. Ranallo added to party Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC(pty:pla), filed by Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Ranallo, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC v. Smartosc US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scanning Technologies Innovations LLC
Represented By: Nicholas R. Ranallo
Represented By: Jay Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartosc US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?