Im v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hee-Sung Im
Defendant: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01011
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company.(Barhoum, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Rory W Leid, III. Filed by Plaintiff Hee-Sung Im. (Leid, Rory) Changed firm address on 8/12/2019 (DS).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5-8 DAY* - Jury Trial is set for 7/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 8/27/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/9/2019, Motions due by 1/8/2020, Discovery completed by 2/7/2020, Dispositive motions due by 3/9/2020, Motions in Limine due by 6/1/2020, Pretrial Order due by 6/23/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/23/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/23/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-8. (Fay, John)
July 22, 2019 Attorney John B Fay for Hee-Sung Im added per #7 Notice to Filer. Attorney admitted to the Western District of WA on 7/15/2019. (PM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Hee-Sung Im (Fay, John)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/22/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint; by Federated Mutual Insurance Company.(Barhoum, John)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting parties' #9 Stipulated Motion for Continuance of Period for First Appearance of Defendant. Defendant's first appearance due by July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
July 9, 2019 REFERRING #9 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Period for First Appearance of Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company to: Judge Marsha J. Pechman (TW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M McCool. (TW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Period for First Appearance of Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Barhoum, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/9/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
July 1, 2019 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (GT)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Barhoum, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company (Barhoum, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of John Barhoum in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal of Action re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service)(Barhoum, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Barhoum, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-12171-8 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5826749), filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barhoum, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Im v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hee-Sung Im
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: John B Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John R Barhoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?