Wineland et al v. Alfa Laval Inc et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Wineland and susan wineland
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc., Alfa Laval, Inc., Invensys Systems, Inc., Weil Pump Company, CURTISS-WRIGHT FLOW CONTROL CORP., AUBURN TECHNOLOGY, INC., Tate Andale, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Taco, Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., CLA-VAL Co., Robertshaw Controls Co., Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc., Tyco International (US) Inc., The Nash Engineering Company, The Wm. Powell Company, Does 1-350 Inclusive, IMO Industries, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Tyco International (US) Inc, The WM Powell Company, Gardner Denver Inc, Cla-Val Co, Cleaver-Brooks Inc, Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, Milwaukee Valve Company Inc, IMO Industries Inc, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc, Invensys Systems Inc, Taco Inc, Auburn Technology Inc, Alfa Laval Inc, Electrolux Home Products Inc, Tate Andale Inc, Robertshaw Controls Co, Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corp and Does 1-350
Case Number: 2:2019cv01017
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 75 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 15. (Weinstein, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Weil Pump Company, filed by Plaintiffs Susan Wineland, Charlotte Wineland. (Weinstein, Brian)
August 27, 2019 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint; by Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc.(Barton, Walter)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #69 Initial Disclosures : Disregard exhibit #1. Per counsel, incorrect document attached in error. Correctly filed as docket #71 (PS)
August 22, 2019 Filing 72 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wood, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 71 EXHIBIT 1 Amended re #69 Initial Disclosures by Defendant Cla-Val Co (Wood, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 70 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Tate Andale Inc.(Wood, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 69 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Cla-Val Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Wood, J.) Modified on 8/22/2019 (PS).
August 22, 2019 Filing 68 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiffs Susan Wineland, Charlotte Wineland.(Weinstein, Brian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 67 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Gardner Denver Inc.(Bosworth, Claude)
August 22, 2019 Filing 66 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corp.(Bosworth, Claude)
August 22, 2019 Filing 65 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc.(Barton, Walter)
August 22, 2019 Filing 64 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant The Nash Engineering Company.(Kopij, Dana)
August 22, 2019 Filing 63 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc.(Horne, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Robert M. Tate, Other Affiliate Tate Andale Holdings for Tate Andale Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tate Andale Inc (Wood, J.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 61 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant The WM Powell Company.(Hicks, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney J. Scott Wood added to party Tate Andale Inc(pty:dft) by Tate Andale Inc.(Wood, J.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 59 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Auburn Technology Inc.(Gardner, Ronald)
August 7, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Auburn Technology Inc.(Gardner, Ronald)
August 2, 2019 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Christine E. Dinsdale filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Dinsdale, Christine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY, filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dinsdale, Christine)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #52 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney George D Yaron for Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #51 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney D. David Steele for Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings as related to C19-793RSL. Judge Barbara J. Rothstein no longer assigned to case. (RM)
July 31, 2019 Attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds for Robertshaw Controls Co added; per #49 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
July 31, 2019 Attorney Rachel Tallon Reynolds for Invensys Systems Inc added; per #48 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
July 31, 2019 Filing 52 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY George D. Yaron FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5867262 (Barton, Walter)
July 31, 2019 Filing 51 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY D. David Steele FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5867218 (Barton, Walter)
July 31, 2019 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint; for Wrongful Death and Survivorship by The WM Powell Company.(Hicks, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Randy J Aliment on behalf of Defendant Robertshaw Controls Co. (Aliment, Randy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Randy J Aliment on behalf of Defendant Invensys Systems Inc. (Aliment, Randy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Alexandra B. Caggiano filed by Plaintiffs Susan Wineland, Charlotte Wineland re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Weinstein, Brian)
July 29, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Susan Wineland, to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weinstein, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bombardier Transit Corp., Corporate Parent Bombardier Transportation Capital, Corporate Parent Bombardier Transportation Investments USA, Corporate Parent Bombardier Transportation Global USA, Corporate Parent Bombardier Transportation Global Holding UK Ltd, Corporate Parent Bombardier Transportation Investment UK Ltd, Corporate Parent Bombardier UK Holding Ltd, Corporate Parent Bombardier Inc. for Auburn Technology Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Auburn Technology Inc (Gardner, Ronald)
July 24, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint; by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.(Babbitt, Diane)
July 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Benjamin Robert Couture for Plaintiffs Susan Wineland, Charlotte Wineland. (Weinstein, Brian)
July 18, 2019 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Griswold Industries, Inc. for Cla-Val Co. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cla-Val Co (Wood, J.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint; by Cla-Val Co.(Wood, J.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J. Scott Wood on behalf of Defendant Cla-Val Co. (Wood, J.)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/29/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/15/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/22/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
July 12, 2019 Attorney Shaun Mary Morgan for Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corp added; per #36 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint; by Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corp.(Bosworth, Claude)
July 12, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corp (Bosworth, Claude)
July 12, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claude Bosworth on behalf of Defendant Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corp. (Bosworth, Claude)
July 12, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Edward Horne on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (Horne, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shaun Mary Morgan on behalf of Defendant Gardner Denver Inc. (Morgan, Shaun)
July 10, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James D Hicks on behalf of Defendant The WM Powell Company. (Hicks, James)
July 10, 2019 NOTE re: Document #29 . Appearance of attorney Shaun Morgan is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (TH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc (Babbitt, Diane)
July 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diane Catherine Babbitt on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc. (Babbitt, Diane)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint; by Gardner Denver Inc.(Bosworth, Claude)
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc. for Gardner Denver Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gardner Denver Inc (Bosworth, Claude)
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling, LLC for IMO Industries Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IMO Industries Inc (Horne, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Milwaukee Valve Company Inc (Tuvim, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Milwaukee Valve Company Inc. (Tuvim, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc for Velan Valve Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Velan Valve Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The WM Powell Company (Hicks, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aurora Pump Company (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Aurora Pump Company.(Hanson, Lorianne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorianne Hanson on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Taco Inc (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Taco Inc.(Hanson, Lorianne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nash Engineering Holdings LLC for The Nash Engineering Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Nash Engineering Company (Kopij, Dana)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lorianne Hanson on behalf of Defendant Taco Inc. (Hanson, Lorianne)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant The Nash Engineering Company. (Kopij, Dana)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alfa Laval Inc (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Robert Madison filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendant Alfa Laval Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dinsdale, Christine)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cleaver-Brooks Inc (Thorson, Timothy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald C Gardner on behalf of Defendant Auburn Technology Inc. (Gardner, Ronald)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Electrolux North America, Inc., Other Affiliate AB Electrolux for Electrolux Home Products Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Electrolux Home Products Inc (Serko, Alice)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 24, #23 Exhibit 25, #24 Exhibit 26, #25 Exhibit 27, #26 Exhibit 28, #27 Exhibit 29, #28 Exhibit 30, #29 Exhibit 31, #30 Exhibit 32, #31 Exhibit 33, #32 Exhibit 34, #33 Exhibit 35, #34 Exhibit 36, #35 Exhibit 37, #36 Exhibit 38, #37 Exhibit 39, #38 Exhibit 40, #39 Exhibit 41, #40 Exhibit 42, #41 Exhibit 43, #42 Exhibit 44, #43 Exhibit 45, #44 Exhibit 46, #45 Exhibit 47, #46 Exhibit 48, #47 Exhibit 49, #48 Exhibit 50, #49 Exhibit 51, #50 Exhibit 52, #51 Exhibit 53, #52 Exhibit 54, #53 Exhibit 55, #54 Exhibit 56)(Barton, Walter)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-00793, by Defendant Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc. (Barton, Walter)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Miles Marine, Inc. for Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc (Barton, Walter)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/9/2019. (GT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
July 2, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-14020-8; (), filed by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Jury Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barton, Walter) (Fee Paid- receipt # 0981-5829050) Modified on 7/1/2019 (PS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wineland et al v. Alfa Laval Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invensys Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTISS-WRIGHT FLOW CONTROL CORP.
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUBURN TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: Timothy Kost Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Eugene Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter, Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco International (US) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wm. Powell Company
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-350 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco International (US) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The WM Powell Company
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cla-Val Co
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc
Represented By: Timothy Kost Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center Inc
Represented By: Walter Eugene Barton
Represented By: George D Yaron
Represented By: D. David Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company Inc
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Diane Catherine Babbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invensys Systems Inc
Represented By: Randy J Aliment
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Inc
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auburn Technology Inc
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale Inc
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Co
Represented By: Randy J Aliment
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corp
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-350
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Wineland
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Couture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: susan wineland
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Couture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?