Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. HD Fowler Company et al
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company and Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: H.D. Fowler Company, Kiewit Infrastructure West Co., HD Fowler Company and Kiewit Infrastructure West Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv01050
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Attorney Melia Preedy for Kiewit Infrastructure West Co added; per #10 Notice of Appearance. (ELS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelia D Wesch on behalf of Defendant Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. (Wesch, Angelia)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.(Lether, Thomas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by HD Fowler Company (Marconi, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Robert S Marconi added to party HD Fowler Company(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff All Plaintiffs by HD Fowler Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix A)(Marconi, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Neal, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Co., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Co., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (Neal, Eric)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 11/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants HD Fowler Company and Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiffs must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/16/2019. (GT)
July 9, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5835818), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons H.D. Fowler Company, #3 Summons Kiewit Infrastructure West Co.)(Lether, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. HD Fowler Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Fowler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure West Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Fowler Company
Represented By: Robert S Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure West Co
Represented By: Angelia D Wesch
Represented By: Melia Preedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?