Northwest Environmental Advocates v. US Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and US Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 2:2019cv01051
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is extended to 9/23/2019; Initial Disclosure Deadline is extended 10/15/2019. (AD)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/17/2019. (AD)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by US Environmental Protection Agency.(Lambert, Michelle)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant US Environmental Protection Agency. (Lambert, Michelle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to US Environmental Protection Agency on 7/17/2019, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Kampmeier, Paul)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant US Environmental Protection Agency. (GT)
July 9, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates (Kampmeier, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Receipt # 0981-5836015), filed by Northwest Environmental Advocates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kampmeier, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Environmental Advocates v. US Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Advocates
Represented By: Paul August Kampmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?