MayDay Movie Productions LLC v. Sava et al
Plaintiff: MayDay Movie Productions, LLC and MayDay Movie Productions LLC
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, Animal Crackers Movie, Ltd., Scott Christian Sava, Blue Dream Studios, Inc., Blue Dream Studios Inc and Animal Crackers Movie Ltd
Case Number: 2:2019cv01053
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 31 Fifth Request for Determination , filed by Scott Christian Sava.(Sava, Scott)
August 29, 2019 Filing 30 Fourth Request for Determination , filed by Scott Christian Sava.(Sava, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Filing 29 Third Request for Determination , filed by Scott Christian Sava.(Sava, Scott)
August 21, 2019 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Animal Crackers Movie, Ltd. on 7/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC. (Sorrell, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 Request for Determination and Request for Dismissal, filed by Scott Christian Sava.(Sava, Scott)
August 15, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Sorrell, Paul)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 Second Request for Determination , filed by Scott Christian Sava.(Sava, Scott)
August 7, 2019 Filing 24 Request for Determination , filed by Scott Christian Sava.(Sava, Scott)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #23 Brief in Opposition: struck through 'COUNTERCLAIM' (MW)
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 COUNTERCLAIM Brief in Opposition against plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC, filed by Scott Christian Sava.(Sava, Scott) Modified docket text on 8/2/2019 (MW).
July 26, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST by Defendant Scott Christian Sava (SWT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 21 Second Request for Determination of why this was granted without my knowledge or chance to defend myself, filed by Scott Christian Sava.(Sava, Scott)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE: Defendant Scott Christian Sava has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Animal Crackers Movie, Ltd. on 7/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC. (Sorrell, Paul)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 Correspondence to the Court filed by Defendant Scott Christian Sava. (MW)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC re #15 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ON DEFENDANT BLUE DREAM STUDIOS, INC. (Sorrell, Paul)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC re #15 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ON DEFENDANT SCOTT CHRISTIAN SAVA (Sorrell, Paul)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: Defendants must file a brief in opposition to MayDay's request for a preliminary injunction on or before 8/8/2019, and MayDay may file a reply on or before 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Blue Dream Studios, Inc. on 7/15/2019, filed by Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC. (Johnson, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Scott Christian Sava on 7/15/2019, filed by Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC. (Johnson, Mark)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, filed by Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/16/2019, (Sorrell, Paul)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Sprangers on behalf of Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC. (Sprangers, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by MayDay Movie Productions LLC (Johnson, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Martin D Singer for Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paul N Sorrell for Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (SNP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Animal Crackers Movie Ltd, Blue Dream Studios Inc, Scott Christian Sava (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SNP)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/16/2019. (SNP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint, Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
July 9, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Martin Singer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5837229 (Johnson, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paul Sorrell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff MayDay Movie Productions, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5837069 (Johnson, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement; Breach of of Two Written Contracts; and Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5836208) Attorney Mark Alan Johnson added to party MayDay Movie Productions, LLC(pty:pla), filed by MayDay Movie Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Scott Sava, #3 Summons Blue Dream Studios, Inc., #4 Summons Animal Crackers Movie, Ltd., #5 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Complaint, #6 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Johnson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MayDay Movie Productions LLC v. Sava et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal Crackers Movie, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Christian Sava
Represented By: Scott Christian Sava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Dream Studios, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Dream Studios Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal Crackers Movie Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MayDay Movie Productions, LLC
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MayDay Movie Productions LLC
Represented By: Mark Alan Johnson
Represented By: Paul N Sorrell
Represented By: Michael Sprangers
Represented By: Martin D Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?