State of Washington v. United States Department of the Navy et al
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: Mark T Esper, United States Department of the Navy, Richard V Spencer, Captain Matthew L Arny, Todd C Mellon and Matthew L Arny
Case Number: 2:2019cv01059
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Cases for All Purposes by parties (Harman, Brigman)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Captain Matthew L. Arny; Mark T. Esper; Todd C. Mellon; Richard V. Spencer; United States Department of the Navy on 7/16/2019, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Janke, Aurora)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brigman L Harman on behalf of Defendants Matthew L Arny, Mark T Esper, Todd C Mellon, Richard V Spencer, United States Department of the Navy. (Harman, Brigman)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/10/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (TH)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Aurora Rose Janke on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Janke, Aurora)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-01062, by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Sherman, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff State of Washington (Sherman, William)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour no longer assigned to case. All future filings shall contain the case number CV19-1059-BJR. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Matthew L Arny, Mark T Esper, Todd C Mellon, and Richard V Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GT)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
July 10, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT State of Washington's Complaint against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5837146) Attorney William R Sherman added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Sherman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. United States Department of the Navy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: William R Sherman
Represented By: Aurora Rose Janke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T Esper
Represented By: Brigman L Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Represented By: Brigman L Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard V Spencer
Represented By: Brigman L Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Matthew L Arny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd C Mellon
Represented By: Brigman L Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew L Arny
Represented By: Brigman L Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?