Avalos v. Baltzell et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Avalos
Defendant: Jeneva Cotton, Schneider, Brian Schuetter, D Dahne, Jane Does 1-6, Renee Wuollet, Vincent Stroup, Department of Corrections, Stefanie L Baltzell, R Donahue, Ronald Haynes, Carpenter, Amanda Kersey, Benjamin P Porter, Schreiber, John Does 1-6, Eric Stielau, Ron Haynes and John and Jane Does 1-6
Case Number: 2:2019cv01066
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 Mail addressed to Carlos Avalos returned as Undeliverable re #9 Notice of Appearance, #10 Waiver of Service, #11 Waiver of Service, #12 Waiver of Service, #13 Waiver of Service, #14 Waiver of Service, #15 Waiver of Service, #16 Waiver of Service, #17 Waiver of Service. Per staff at MCC-Monroe, inmate transferred to WCC-Shelton on 8/21/19. Docket updated; notice regenerated for dockets 9-17. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(PS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Renee Wuollet mailed on 7/15/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Vincent Stroup mailed on 7/15/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Eric Stielau mailed on 7/15/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Brian Schuetter mailed on 7/15/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Benjamin P Porter mailed on 7/15/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Ron Haynes mailed on 7/15/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant R Donahue mailed on 7/15/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant D Dahne mailed on 7/15/2019 **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine Joy Faber on behalf of Defendants D Dahne, R Donahue, Ron Haynes, Benjamin P Porter, Brian Schuetter, Eric Stielau, Vincent Stroup, Renee Wuollet. **PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(Faber, Katherine)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING RENEWED SERVICE Documents served electronically to Stafford Creek: Stefani L. Baltzell, Amanda Kersey, Ronald Haynes, Jenva Cotton, D. Dahne, Schreiber (custody program), Schneider (nurse), Benjamin P. Porter, Renee Wuollet, Brian Schuetter, Vincent Stroup, Eric Stielau, Carpenter (sergeant), R. Donahue (psychiatrist) and Department of Corrections, on 8/5/2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(MW)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 At the direction of the assigned Magistrate Judge, Hon. Brian A Tsuchida, the 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, Dkt. #4 , and the Declaration of plaintiff in support of the complaint, Dkt. #6 , shall hereby together constitute Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. By separate order, the Clerk shall serve the amended complaint upon defendants.**0 1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(AE) Modified on 8/8/2019 to reflect correct page count (MET).
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Carlos Avalos with Attachments in Support of Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. 1983 #4 Complaint, by Plaintiff Carlos Avalos **7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(TH)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER TO PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Documents served electronically to: Stafford Creek: Stefani L Baltzell, Amanda Kersey, Ronald Haynes, Jenva Cotton, D Dahne, Schrieber(custody program), Schneider (nurse), Benjamin P Porter, Renee Wuollet, Brian Schuetter, Vincent Stroup, Eric Stielau, Carpenter (sergeant), R Donahue (psychiatrist) and Department of Corrections on 7/15/19. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(SG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Carlos Avalos against defendant(s) Stefanie L Baltzell, Carpenter, Jeneva Cotton, D Dahne, Department of Corrections, Jane Does 1-6, John Does 1-6, R Donahue, Ronald Haynes, Amanda Kersey, Benjamin P Porter, Schneider, Schreiber, Brian Schuetter, Eric Stielau, Vincent Stroup, Renee Wuollet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**65 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(ST)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(ST)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(ST)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Tsuchida, filed by Carlos Avalos. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)**69 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Carlos Avalos, Prisoner ID: 359594)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos v. Baltzell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeneva Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Schuetter
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Dahne
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Wuollet
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Stroup
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie L Baltzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Donahue
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Kersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin P Porter
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Stielau
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Represented By: Katherine Joy Faber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Avalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?