Chiluvane v. ICE Field Office Director
Petitioner: Salito Chilovane and Salito Chiluvane
Respondent: ICE Field Office Director
Case Number: 2:2019cv01069
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Dkt. #8 ) NOTED on motion calendar: Noting Date 9/27/2019. (SWT)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by ICE Field Office Director. Noting Date 9/27/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kniffin, Margot)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Margot P Kniffin on behalf of Respondent ICE Field Office Director. (Kniffin, Margot)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR RETURN AND STATUS REPORT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Electronic posting of this Order shall effect service on the United Sates Attorney and respondent(s). Within 30 days of the date of this Order, respondent(s) shall file a return and status report. In accordance with LCR 7, respondent(s) shall note the return for consideration on the fourth Friday after it is filed. Petitioner may file and serve a response not later than the Monday immediately preceding the Friday appointed for consideration. (cc: petitioner) (SG)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 2241 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Salito Chiluvane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SG)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: Petitioner)(SG)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Salito Chiluvane. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)(ST)
July 26, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected (ST)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 8/12/2019 to correct (SG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Salito Chilovane. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 2241 Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiluvane v. ICE Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Salito Chilovane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Salito Chiluvane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE Field Office Director
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Margot P Kniffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?