Brooks Manufacturing Company v. United States Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brooks Manufacturing Company
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01077
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Britta A Sahlstrom for United States Fire Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katie I Falkenberg for United States Fire Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy J Fagan for United States Fire Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Britta Sahlstrom FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5905724 (Forsberg, Carl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katie I. Falkenberg FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5905711 (Forsberg, Carl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy J. Fagan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5905705 (Forsberg, Carl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by United States Fire Insurance Company (Forsberg, Carl)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE TO PARTIES: Judge Richard A. Jones adopts the deadlines set forth in the #6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT previously entered by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (VE)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly recuses himself and the case is reassigned in rotation to the Honorable Richard A. Jones, United States District Judge. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C19-1077 RAJ. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by parties (Forsberg, Carl)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carl Edward Forsberg on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Forsberg, Carl)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Fire Insurance Company on 7/24/2019, filed by Plaintiff Brooks Manufacturing Company. (Carr, Susannah)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant(s) United States Fire Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND, filed by Brooks Manufacturing Company.(Carr, Susannah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Brooks Manufacturing Company (Bludorn, Miles)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/16/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. (GT)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Brooks Manufacturing Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/19/2019. (GT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
July 12, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiff Brooks Manufacturing Company (Carr, Susannah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Brooks Manufacturing Company. (Carr, Susannah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant(s) United States Fire Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5841613) Attorney Susannah Carr added to party Brooks Manufacturing Company(pty:pla), filed by Brooks Manufacturing Company.(Carr, Susannah) Modified on 7/15/2019 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks Manufacturing Company v. United States Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooks Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Susannah Carr
Represented By: Miles C Bludorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Britta A Sahlstrom
Represented By: Timothy J Fagan
Represented By: Katie I Falkenberg
Represented By: Carl Edward Forsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?