DomainMarket LLC v. Lakes Gas Co
Plaintiff: DomainMarket, LLC d/b/a DomainMarket.com and DomainMarket LLC
Defendant: Lakes Gas Co. and Lakes Gas Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv01089
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Parties' #16 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice: It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION For Dismissal With Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC. Noting Date 9/6/2019, (Rava, William)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from Defendant Lakes Gas Co. regarding settlement filed by Lakes Gas Co (O'Shea, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Parties' #12 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint: The time for Defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended to 8/27/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by parties (O'Shea, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy O'Shea on behalf of Defendant Lakes Gas Co. (O'Shea, Timothy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Lakes Gas Co on 7/17/2019 (Lance, Holly)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Holly Lance for Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James L. Bikoff for Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Holly B. Lance FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5849873 (Rava, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James L. Bikoff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff DomainMarket LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5849831 (Rava, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SNP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Lakes Gas Co (SNP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DM Holdings LLC for DomainMarket LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DomainMarket LLC (Rava, William)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/23/2019. (SNP)
July 16, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SNP)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Lakes Gas Co. (Receipt # 0981-5845498) Attorney William C Rava added to party DomainMarket, LLC d/b/a DomainMarket.com(pty:pla), filed by DomainMarket, LLC d/b/a DomainMarket.com. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Rava, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DomainMarket LLC v. Lakes Gas Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakes Gas Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakes Gas Co
Represented By: Timothy O'Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DomainMarket, LLC d/b/a DomainMarket.com
Represented By: William C Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DomainMarket LLC
Represented By: William C Rava
Represented By: Holly Lance
Represented By: James L. Bikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?