Chaudhry v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Chaudhry
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, DHS, William Pelham Barr, USCIS, Kevin K McAleenan, FBI, Christopher Wray and Cynthia Munita
Case Number: 2:2019cv01097
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1255
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER entered upon the authority of Judge Richard A. Jones. Deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 12/9/2019. Initial case scheduling deadlines are extended as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/9/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/16/2019, Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2019. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (VE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Defendants William Pelham Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Christopher Wray re #6 Initial Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gugin, Patricia)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE filed by Plaintiff Muhammad Chaudhry. (PM)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/9/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/16/2019, Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (VE)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Brian T. Moran (U.S. Attorney), Cynthia Munita, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K McAleenan, William Pelham Barr, Christopher Wray on 7/16/2019, filed by Plaintiff Muhammad Chaudhry. (TH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patricia D Gugin on behalf of Defendants William Pelham Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Christopher Wray. (Gugin, Patricia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (VE)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Muhammad Chaudhry against defendant(s) William Pelham Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Kevin K McAleenan, Cynthia Munita, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Christopher Wray with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # TAC015788) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaudhry v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Munita
Represented By: Patricia D Gugin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?