Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund et al v. North Coast Iron Corp et al
Plaintiff: Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust, Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund, Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund and Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity Inc., North Coast Iron Corp and Ironshore Indemnity Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01098
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler: Bench Trial is set for 9/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12A before Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Length of trial: 3 days. Joinder of Parties due by 10/11/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/1/2020, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 4/22/2020, Motions due by 5/1/2020, Discovery completed by 6/1/2020, Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2020, Settlement conference to be held or completed by 7/30/2020, 39.1 Mediation held no later than 8/28/2020, Motions in Limine due by 8/31/2020, Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2020, Trial briefs/Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/21/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12A before Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AGAINST DEFENDANT NORTH COAST IRON CORP signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(KMP)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER ON CONSENT to proceed before a Magistrate Judge; Case reassigned to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler for all further proceedings; Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Against North Coast Iron Corp, filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund, Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/13/2019, (Dwarzski, Noelle)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER striking #9 Notice-Other, filed by Plaintiffs. The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, Chief United States District Judge: On August 21, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a Notice of Receivership and Stay of Proceedings Against Defendant North Coast Iron Corp. Dkt. #9 . Plaintiffs' Notice does not cite to legal authority, but the Court presumes that the stay is sought pursuant to section 7.60.110 of the Revised Code of Washington. To the extent that provision is applicable to actions in federal court, the statute provides that the relief is automatic upon "the entry of an order appointing a general receiver or a custodial receiver." RCW 7.60.110. Plaintiffs' Notice indicates only that "Defendant North Coast Iron Corp has filed for Receivership" in a state court action. Dkt. #9 . Plaintiffs do not indicate that a receiver has been appointed and do not attach an order appointing a receiver. Further, Plaintiffs' Notice appears to seek affirmative relief from the Court but was not submitted as a stipulation motion, was not noted as a contested motion, and did not include a proposed order as required by Local Civil Rules 7 and 10. Accordingly, and for these reasons, the Court strikes Plaintiffs' Notice of Receivership and Stay of Proceedings Against Defendant North Coast Iron Corp. (Dkt. #9 ) as procedurally improper. Plaintiffs may refile in accordance with the applicable rules. (CAO)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Receivership ; filed by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund, Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
August 9, 2019 Attorneys Haylee Hurst and Erin R Jajtner added as counsel for Defendant North Coast Iron Corp per #8 Praecipe to Attach Document. (PM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE to attach document Corrected Signature Page re #7 Notice of Appearance by Defendant North Coast Iron Corp (Lee, Mark)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #7 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Haylee J. Hurst and Erin R. Jajtner. As such, these attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (PM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark J Lee on behalf of Defendant North Coast Iron Corp. (Lee, Mark)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/29/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund, Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust (Dwarzski, Noelle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul Keane Friedrich on behalf of Defendant Ironshore Indemnity Inc. (Friedrich, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ironshore Indemnity Inc, North Coast Iron Corp (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/24/2019 (if applicable). (SNP)
July 17, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,,, and Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund, Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dwarzski, Noelle)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5847410) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust(pty:pla), filed by Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund, Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund, Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust.(Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund et al v. North Coast Iron Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Ironworkers Retirement Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Northwest Ironworkers Health and Security Fund
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Ironworkers & Employers Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Field Ironworkers Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Iron Corp
Represented By: Haylee Hurst
Represented By: Mark J Lee
Represented By: Erin R Jajtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity Inc
Represented By: Paul Keane Friedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?