Firs Home Owners Association v. City of SeaTac
Plaintiff: Firs Home Owners Association
Defendant: City of SeaTac
Case Number: 2:2019cv01130
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brendan Wesley Donckers on behalf of Plaintiff Firs Home Owners Association. (Donckers, Brendan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: Defendant's #6 Notice of Pendency of Other Action in Another Jurisdiction or Forum. In light of the fact that neither party seeks a stay of this matter, the Court will not exercise its broad discretion to phase the proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Mary Elizabeth Mirante Bartolo on behalf of Defendant City of SeaTac. (Mirante Bartolo, Mary)
August 16, 2019 Attorney Mark Sterling Johnsen for City of SeaTac added; per #13 Notice of Attorney Association. (MW)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Defendant City of SeaTac to #10 Response to Motion, #6 MOTION to Stay (Harper, Kenneth)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of V O Barraza in Support of Response to Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff Firs Home Owners Association re #6 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Barraza, Vicente)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Firs Home Owners Association, to #6 MOTION to Stay. (Barraza, Vicente)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Firs Home Owners Association (Barraza, Vicente)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Quinn N Plant on behalf of Defendant City of SeaTac. (Plant, Quinn)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER NOTING MOTION ON THE COURT'S CALENDAR: Defendant's #6 Notice of Pendency of Other Action contains a request that the Court stay the above-captioned matter until a land use petition plaintiff previously filed in King County Superior Court is resolved. The notice and request for a stay is noted for consideration on the Court's calendar for 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in King County, case number in other court 17-2-07094-7 ; filed by Defendant City of SeaTac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Harper, Kenneth) Modified to add motion on 7/31/2019 (MW).
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses by City of SeaTac.(Harper, Kenneth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
July 23, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
July 23, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Firs Home Owners Association must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/30/2019. (GT)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant City of SeaTac re #1 Notice of Removal, to Federal Court (Harper, Kenneth)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-17560-5; (Receipt # 0981-5854077) Attorney Kenneth W Harper added to party City of SeaTac(pty:dft), filed by City of SeaTac. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Jury Demand)(Harper, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firs Home Owners Association v. City of SeaTac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of SeaTac
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Mirante Bartolo
Represented By: Kenneth W Harper
Represented By: Mark Sterling Johnsen
Represented By: Quinn N Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firs Home Owners Association
Represented By: Vicente Omar Barraza
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Represented By: Brendan Wesley Donckers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?