Varghis v. Apple Inc
Plaintiff: Nina Varghis
Defendant: Apple Inc. and Apple Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01136
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *5-6 days*. Bench Trial is set for 1/11/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 9/23/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/15/2020, Motions due by 8/14/2020, Discovery completed by 9/14/2020, Dispositive motions due by 10/13/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/12/2020, Motions in Limine due by 11/30/2020, Pretrial Order due by 12/21/2020, Deposition Designations due by 12/23/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/4/2021, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 1/4/2021. (AD)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5-6. (Tompkins, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/28/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/11/2019. (AD)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven E Swaney for Defendant Apple Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven E. Swaney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Apple Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5861179 (Khachatourians, Natasha)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
July 24, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Apple Inc. (Tompkins, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Apple Inc.. (Tompkins, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal from King County Superior Court by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tompkins, Christopher)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 18-2-27011-1; (Receipt # 0981-5856076) Attorney Christopher W Tompkins added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Tompkins, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varghis v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Steven E Swaney
Represented By: Natasha A Khachatourians
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Varghis
Represented By: Carl A Taylor Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?