United States of America v. Almeda et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Renato M. Almeda, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Estate of Corazon C. Almeda, PNC Bank, N.A., King County, Washington, King County Washington, PNC Bank NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Estate of Corazon C Almeda and Renato M Almeda
Case Number: 2:2019cv01137
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Estate of Corazon C Almeda on 8/30/2019 (Golden, Jennifer)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Jacob Franco on behalf of Defendant Renato M Almeda. (Franco, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Renato M Almeda on 8/8/2019 (Golden, Jennifer)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant King County Washington on 8/1/2019 (Golden, Jennifer)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA on 7/30/2019 (Golden, Jennifer)
August 20, 2019 Attorney Frederick A Haist for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (KMP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Fred B Burnside on behalf of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Burnside, Fred)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Margaret A Pahl on behalf of Defendant King County Washington. (Pahl, Margaret)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant PNC Bank NA on 7/30/2019 (Golden, Jennifer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Renato M Almeda, Estate of Corazon C Almeda, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, King County Washington, and PNC Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GT) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/25/2019 with flattened version) (GT).
July 24, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Jennifer Y Golden added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Renato Almeda, #3 Summons - Estate of Corazon Almeda, #4 Summons - JPMorgan Chase Bank, #5 Summons - PNC Bank, #6 Summons - King County)(Golden, Jennifer) (No Fee Required)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Almeda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renato M. Almeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Corazon C. Almeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County, Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Washington
Represented By: Margaret A Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Corazon C Almeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renato M Almeda
Represented By: Robert Jacob Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Y Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?