Baker v. G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Baker
Defendant: G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01182
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC (Turner, Sarah)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/24/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/1/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah N Turner on behalf of Defendant G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC. (Turner, Sarah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC on 7/31/2019, filed by Plaintiff Brian Baker. (Terasaki, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC. (GT)
July 31, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (GT)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC (Receipt # 0981-5865315) Attorney Michael M Terasaki added to party Brian Baker(pty:pla), filed by Brian Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terasaki, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&I VII Redmond Retail LLC
Represented By: Sarah N Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Baker
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Michael M Terasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?