Barrera et al v. Boeing Employees Credit Union
Plaintiff: Angela Bovo and Paul Barrera
Defendant: Boeing Employees Credit Union
Case Number: 2:2019cv01197
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AMENDING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida, re #22 Stipulation. Amended Complaint due by 10/11/2019, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 11/1/2019, Motion to Dismiss due by 11/8/2019, Opposition Brief due by 12/6/2019, Reply Brief due by 12/20/2019. (TF)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by parties re #17 Order,, Set Deadlines, (Burnside, Fred)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sophia Gold for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera and Angela Bovo, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey Kaliel for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera and for Angela Bovo, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sophia Gold FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera, Angela Bovo (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5920689 (Stephens, Kim)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey Kaliel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera, Angela Bovo (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5920667 (Stephens, Kim)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED (Dkt. #16 ) BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Defendant's motion to dismiss due by 9/19/2019 and shall note it for 10/31/2019, Plaintiff's Responsive Brief due by 10/17/2019, Defendant's Reply Brief due by 10/31/2019. (AE)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by parties (Burnside, Fred)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/20/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/4/2019, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (MW)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (KMP)
August 20, 2019 Attorneys Rebecca J Francis, Tim Cunningham for Boeing Employees Credit Union added; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (KMP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 8/26/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Fred B Burnside on behalf of Defendant Boeing Employees Credit Union. (Burnside, Fred)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher D Jennings for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera and for Angela Bovo, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Boeing Employees Credit Union on 8/2/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Paul Barrera, Angela Bovo. (Stephens, Kim)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher D. Jennings FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera, Angela Bovo (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5873712 (Stephens, Kim)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Boeing Employees Credit Union. (GT)
August 2, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney J Gerard Stranch, IV for Paul Barrera and Angela Bovo, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Martin F Schubert for Paul Barrera and Angela Bovo, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lynn A Toops for Paul Barrera and Angela Bovo, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(JEM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY J. Gerard Stranch, IV FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera, Angela Bovo (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5868406 (Stephens, Kim)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Martin F. Schubert FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera, Angela Bovo (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5868375 (Stephens, Kim)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lynn A. Toops FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Paul Barrera, Angela Bovo (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5868354 (Stephens, Kim)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Boeing Employees Credit Union with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5868335), filed by Angela Bovo, Paul Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Stephens, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrera et al v. Boeing Employees Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Bovo
Represented By: Lynn A Toops
Represented By: Martin F Schubert
Represented By: J Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Represented By: Jeffrey Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia Gold
Represented By: Christopher D Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Barrera
Represented By: Lynn A Toops
Represented By: Martin F Schubert
Represented By: J Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: Cecily C Shiel
Represented By: Jeffrey Kaliel
Represented By: Sophia Gold
Represented By: Christopher D Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Employees Credit Union
Represented By: Tim Cunningham
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Rebecca J Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?