McMillan v. Red Roof Inns Inc
Plaintiff: Robert McMillan
Defendant: Red Roof Inns, Inc. and Red Roof Inns Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01230
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *3-5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 2/1/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 10/22/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/5/2020, Motions due by 9/4/2020, Discovery completed by 10/5/2020, Dispositive motions due by 11/3/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 12/3/2020, Motions in Limine due by 12/21/2020, Pretrial Order due by 1/11/2021, Deposition Designations due by 1/13/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/25/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/25/2021. (AD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-5. (Hayasaka, Keith)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/17/2019. (AD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Red Roof Inns Inc (Hayasaka, Keith)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint; by Red Roof Inns Inc.(Hayasaka, Keith)
August 7, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Red Roof Inns Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/14/2019. (GT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
August 7, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Red Roof Inns, Inc. (Hayasaka, Keith)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior, case number 19-2-17874-4; (Receipt # 0981-5875037), filed by Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayasaka, Keith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #3 Complaint) (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillan v. Red Roof Inns Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McMillan
Represented By: Kyle Drinnon
Represented By: Jason M Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Inns, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Marc Hayasaka
Represented By: Heather M. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Inns Inc
Represented By: Keith Marc Hayasaka
Represented By: Heather M. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?