Northwest Administrators Inc v. Central Pre-Mix Concrete Co
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Central Pre-Mix Concrete CO
Case Number: 2:2019cv01236
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 1 day. Bench Trial is set for 2/1/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 10/18/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/5/2020, Discovery completed by 10/4/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/18/2020, Dispositive motions due by 11/3/2020, Motions in Limine due by 1/4/2021, Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2021, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 1/27/2021 (KERR)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Central Pre-Mix Concrete Co (Wood, Jeremy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas A Leahy on behalf of Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Leahy, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 1. (Leahy, Thomas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Kellie A. Tabor, on behalf of Central Pre-Mix Concrete Co., Defendant, on 8/20/2019. (Reid, Russell)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
August 12, 2019 Attorney Jeremy F. Wood for Central Pre-Mix Concrete Co added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kellie Anne Tabor on behalf of Defendant Central Pre-Mix Concrete Co. (Tabor, Kellie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Central Pre-Mix Concrete Co. (GT)
August 8, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Compel Audit against defendant(s) Central Pre-Mix Concrete CO (Receipt # 0981-5876272), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Central Pre-Mix Concrete Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Represented By: Thomas A Leahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Pre-Mix Concrete CO
Represented By: Kellie Anne Tabor
Represented By: Jeremy F. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?