Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust et al v. Penhall Company
Plaintiff: Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust and Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust
Defendant: Penhall Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01238
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Penhall Company. Plaintiffs' #8 MOTION for Default is granted. Defendant Penhall Company is in default. (VE)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Mary L. Stoll filed by Plaintiffs Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust re #8 MOTION for Default (Stoll, Mary)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Default , filed by Plaintiffs Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/2/2019, (Stoll, Mary)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Penhall Co c/o Corporation Service Co, Registered Agent Junta Huey on 8/22/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust. (Stoll, Mary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Penhall Company (MW)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust (Stoll, Mary)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
August 8, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust (Stoll, Mary)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Penhall Company (Receipt # 0981-5876312) Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Lisa Stoll added to party Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust(pty:pla), filed by Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers, Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust, Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust, Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, #2 Supplement Letter Requesting assignment to Seattle division, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Labor Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B -- Trust Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C -- Auditor letter)(Stoll, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust et al v. Penhall Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penhall Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington and Northern Idaho District Council of Laborers
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Laborers-Employers Health & Security Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Laborers-Employers Training Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Washington Laborers-Employers Pension Trust
Represented By: Mary Lisa Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?