Piesik v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Margaret Rae Piesik and Gary Herbert Piesik
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01255
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in the Northern District of California as case 3:19-cv-05660 on 9/9/2019. (PM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-149); in re ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. (Attachments: #1 Email re: case transfer) (PM)
September 4, 2019 Case sent to the Northern District of Caliornia by electronic case transfer. (PM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 16-md-02741, by Plaintiff Margaret Rae Piesik. (Yackulic, Corrie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re [1 -1] Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (MET)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Monsanto Company. (GT)
August 12, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Monsanto Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5879554) Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Gary Herbert Piesik(pty:pla), Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Margaret Rae Piesik(pty:pla), filed by Margaret Rae Piesik, Gary Herbert Piesik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piesik v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Rae Piesik
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Herbert Piesik
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?