Central Freight Lines Inc v. Piller
Plaintiff: Central Freight Lines, Inc. and Central Freight Lines Inc
Defendant: Christian Piller
Case Number: 2:2019cv01257
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Law Firm Name Change ; filed by Defendant Christian Piller. (Block, Steven)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Steven W. Block filed by Defendant Christian Piller re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Block, Steven)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Defendant Christian Piller, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Block, Steven)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Central Freight Lines Inc, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Remand Improperly Removed Case and for Fees (Downs, Jacob)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jacob M. Downs filed by Plaintiff Central Freight Lines Inc re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Downs, Jacob)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Central Freight Lines Inc, to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Downs, Jacob)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Christian Piller filed by Defendant Christian Piller re #10 MOTION to Remand Improperly Removed Case and for Fees (Block, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Steven W. Block filed by Defendant Christian Piller re #10 MOTION to Remand Improperly Removed Case and for Fees (Block, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Defendant Christian Piller, to #10 MOTION to Remand Improperly Removed Case and for Fees. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Block, Steven)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jacob M. Downs filed by Plaintiff Central Freight Lines Inc re #10 MOTION to Remand Improperly Removed Case and for Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Downs, Jacob)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Improperly Removed Case and for Fees, filed by Plaintiff Central Freight Lines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/27/2019, (Downs, Jacob)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Christian Piller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/27/2019, (Block, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge James L. Robart as related to C17-814JLR. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Parties' #7 Stipulation Extending Defendant's Answer Deadline: Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Answer Deadline by parties (Block, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:17-cv-00814-JLR, by Defendant Christian Piller. (Block, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDMENT to the Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Christian Piller (Block, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Central Freight Lines Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/19/2019. (GT)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
August 12, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-09282-3 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5879877), filed by Christian Piller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Block, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #2 Complaint) (GT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Freight Lines Inc v. Piller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Piller
Represented By: Steven William Block
Represented By: Christopher A Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Freight Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Freight Lines Inc
Represented By: Robert L. Gillette
Represented By: Jacob M Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?